U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00374-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SAER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Statement of Offense]
  • January 19, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 18, 2023: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • January 18, 2023: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • January 11, 2023: [Status Conference]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 08, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 18, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 18, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 17, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.