U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00378-1
  • Case Name: USA v. COPELAND et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [.Order]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • March 18, 2025: [Transcript]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • December 16, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 15, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • December 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 13, 2022: [Bond ]
  • December 06, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • December 06, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 06, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 06, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • December 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • November 30, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • November 30, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • November 30, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 28, 2022: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court - Magistrate Judge Case]
  • November 27, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • November 18, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 18, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 17, 2022: [Indictment]
  • November 16, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.