U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00219
  • Case Name: Marilyn Hurd
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing Notice - Hearing Continued - Trustee]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors Held (With Attachments)]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Personal Financial Managment Course]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Certification About A Financial Management Course (Original or Amended)]
November, 2022
  • November 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Original or Amended)]
  • November 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • November 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice of Appearance (Add Party to Matrix)]
  • November 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • November 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors 13 (Auto Assigned)]
  • November 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • November 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • November 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • November 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • November 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • November 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • November 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2 (Original or Amended)]
  • November 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income 122C-1 (Original or Amended)]
  • November 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • November 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • November 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2 (Original or Amended)]
  • November 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income 122C-1 (Original or Amended)]
  • November 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • November 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.