U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00379-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HAIRSTON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • January 06, 2023: [Dismiss Case]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 29, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • November 29, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • November 29, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 29, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • November 29, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 29, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • November 29, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • November 29, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • November 27, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • November 25, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • November 22, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • November 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 21, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • November 21, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 21, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 18, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.