U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00375-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CAREY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • December 23, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 23, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • December 23, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • December 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 23, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • December 23, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • November 28, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 28, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 28, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • November 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 18, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
  • November 18, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 18, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.