U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00381-1
  • Case Name: USA v. THERRES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Statement of Offense]
  • January 23, 2023: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • January 23, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 23, 2023: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • January 23, 2023: [Referred for PSI Report]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 05, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 05, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • December 02, 2022: [Notice of Courtroom Change]
  • December 01, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions for High Intensity Supervision Program]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • November 22, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 22, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 22, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • November 22, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 21, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • November 21, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 21, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.