U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00382-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HAWKINS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • December 13, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 06, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • November 29, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 29, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • November 29, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 29, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 29, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • November 29, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • November 29, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • November 23, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.