U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00363-2
  • Case Name: USA v. NELSON et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • January 06, 2023: [.Order]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • December 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 13, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 08, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • December 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 07, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 07, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • December 07, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 07, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • December 07, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 30, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • November 30, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 23, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 23, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • November 23, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 23, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • November 23, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 23, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • November 23, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 23, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • November 23, 2022: [.Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.