U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00386-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ENFIELD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • January 13, 2023: [Statement of Offense]
  • January 13, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 13, 2023: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • January 13, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • January 13, 2023: [Vacate]
  • January 10, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 01, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 01, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.