U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00117
  • Case Name: IN RE JEFFREY B. CLARK
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • December 19, 2022: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • December 15, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • December 15, 2022: [Consolidate Cases]
  • December 14, 2022: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • December 12, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Remand to State Court]
  • November 28, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.