U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00342-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WALKER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [.Order]
  • January 09, 2023: [Status Conference]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 08, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • December 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 07, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • December 05, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 05, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • December 05, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • December 02, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • December 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 29, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 29, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • November 29, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • November 29, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 29, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 29, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.