U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00380-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BIAS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Transcript]
  • October 07, 2024: [Transcript]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 07, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • December 06, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • December 05, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • December 05, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • December 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 01, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 01, 2022: [Appear]
  • December 01, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • December 01, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 01, 2022: [.Order]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 30, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 30, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.