U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00222-
  • Case Name: Shawniece Keturah Clark
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Reconsider Dismissal of Case]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [eNoticing Request Form]
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order Dismiss Case]
  • December 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order To File Amended Certificate Of Credit Counseling Or Show Cause]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Amended Voluntary Petition]
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.