U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00393-1
  • Case Name: USA v. COHEN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Exclude]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 09, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • December 09, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 09, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • December 05, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 05, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 02, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • December 02, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • December 01, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.