U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00225-
  • Case Name: Janice A White
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Certification About A Financial Management Course (Original or Amended)]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Appearance (Attorney)]
  • December 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Notice of Appearance (Add Party to Matrix)]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Notice Of Requirement To File Certification About A Financial Management Course (Ch 7)]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.