U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00221-
  • Case Name: Shanay Wee Wee Hawkins
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 21, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 20, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds]
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order Dismiss Case]
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • January 13, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order - Generic]
  • January 13, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • January 03, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [First Meeting of Creditors Continued (TRUSTEE ONLY 341 Filings)]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order To Show Cause]
  • December 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order To Show Cause Failure To Pay Installments]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Amended Voluntary Petition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.