U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00226
  • Case Name: DGA Holdings, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Amend/Modify]
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Notice - Generic]
  • January 23, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Statement Adjourning (Continuing) Meeting of Creditors (by Trustee)]
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • January 18, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Notice - Generic]
  • January 18, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Dismiss Case]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Status Report]
  • January 03, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Statement Adjourning (Continuing) Meeting of Creditors (by Trustee)]
  • January 03, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Condition Rights]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Condition Rights]
  • December 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury - Form 202]
  • December 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [List of Creditors and Mailing Matrix]
  • December 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Original or Amended)]
  • December 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Equity Security Holders (Original or Amended)]
  • December 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
  • December 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Schedule H]
  • December 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Schedule G]
  • December 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Schedule E/F]
  • December 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Schedule D]
  • December 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Schedule A/B]
  • December 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • December 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Change of Address]
  • December 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • December 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • December 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Hearing - Scheduled (by Order) BK]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [First Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee]
  • December 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Almy, Monique Desiree [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Deficiency Letter - Case Opening]
  • December 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • December 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.