U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00395-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BURTON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Reduce Sentence- USSC Amendment]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Disclosure ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Rule]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • December 09, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • December 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 08, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • December 08, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • December 08, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 07, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 07, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • December 07, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • December 06, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.