U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-10014-
  • Case Name: Enovational Corp. v. State of Maryland
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • April 01, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Reply]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing (Original or Amended)]
  • March 25, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Opposition]
  • March 13, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 11, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Amended Notice]
  • March 11, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Notice - Generic]
  • March 11, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • March 10, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Generic (USE ONLY IF NO OTHER EVENT MATCHES)]
December, 2024
  • December 10, 2024: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Notice - Generic]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Opportunity to Object (Correction)]
  • January 13, 2023: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • January 13, 2023: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing - Scheduled (AP)]
  • January 13, 2023: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Stipulation]
  • January 09, 2023: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Motion - Generic (USE ONLY IF NO OTHER EVENT MATCHES)]
  • January 06, 2023: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Stipulation]
  • January 06, 2023: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • December 06, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.