U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00396-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WHITE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 12, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 12, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • December 12, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 12, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • December 12, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 12, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 12, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • December 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 07, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.