U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00228-
  • Case Name: A Better Way of Life, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Statement Adjourning (Continuing) Meeting of Creditors (by Trustee)]
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Original or Amended)]
  • January 04, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • January 02, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Condition Rights]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Condition Rights]
  • December 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Reject Lease or Executory Contract]
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Opposition]
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing (Original or Amended)]
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Stay]
  • December 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Scheduled (BK)]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [First Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Verification Of Authority To File]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.