U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00399-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ROBINSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 19, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • December 19, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 19, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 13, 2022: [Exclude]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order]
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • December 08, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.