U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00188-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LIPSCOMBE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • January 20, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 18, 2023: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • January 18, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 18, 2023: [Statement of Offense]
  • January 18, 2023: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 11, 2023: [Sentencing]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 12, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • December 09, 2022: [Errata]
  • December 08, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.