U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00398-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BAPTISTE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Status Conference]
  • January 19, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 20, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • December 20, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 20, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • December 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 19, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 13, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • December 09, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 09, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.