U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00230
  • Case Name: David Joshua Beeson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Original or Amended)]
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Certification About A Financial Management Course (Original or Amended)]
December, 2022
  • December 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
  • December 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice of Appearance (Add Party to Matrix)]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors 13 (Auto Assigned)]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2 (Original or Amended)]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income 122C-1 (Original or Amended)]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2 (Original or Amended)]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income 122C-1 (Original or Amended)]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.