U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00169-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DUGGAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 22, 2025: [Protective Order ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.