U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00392-1
  • Case Name: USA v. AL-MARIMI
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Filing Redacted Document]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • May 05, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 02, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 02, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Courtroom Change]
October, 2024
  • October 23, 2024: [Response to Order of the Court]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 09, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 09, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 08, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 19, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 13, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 13, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 13, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • December 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • December 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 13, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.