U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00402-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DC GLASS GALLERY, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Stipulation]
  • January 19, 2023: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • January 19, 2023: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 19, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 19, 2023: [Statement of Offense]
  • January 19, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 19, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 19, 2023: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 05, 2023: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 04, 2023: [Notice of Error]
  • January 04, 2023: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • December 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Exclude]
  • December 13, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.