U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00403-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HUTTLE et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • January 05, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • January 04, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • December 21, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • December 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 15, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 15, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 14, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.