U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00401-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MINOR et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 11, 2024: [Re-entry Progress Hearing]
  • October 11, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • January 04, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 04, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • January 04, 2023: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 16, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 14, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 14, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 14, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • December 14, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 14, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 14, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.