U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00406-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ARDOLINO
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 10, 2023: [Status Conference]
  • January 10, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • January 10, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 10, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 10, 2023: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • January 06, 2023: [Protective Order ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Disclosure ]
  • January 05, 2023: [.Order]
  • January 04, 2023: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 15, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 15, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 15, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.