U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00404-1
  • Case Name: USA v. EASTERDAY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 20, 2023: [Bond Set/Reset]
  • January 20, 2023: [Bond Hearing]
  • January 19, 2023: [Reply in Support]
  • January 17, 2023: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • January 13, 2023: [Status Conference]
  • January 13, 2023: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • January 12, 2023: [Revoke]
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Disclosure ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 05, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 05, 2023: [Protective Order ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Speedy Trial ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 03, 2023: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • January 03, 2023: [.Order]
  • January 03, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 15, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.