U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00408-1
  • Case Name: USA v. KELLEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Reply in Support]
  • October 10, 2024: [Exhibit List ]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 10, 2024: [Witness List]
  • October 10, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • October 07, 2024: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • October 04, 2024: [Response to motion]
  • October 02, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • September 30, 2024: [Dismiss Count(s)]
  • September 27, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 26, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
  • September 26, 2024: [Extension of Time to]
  • September 26, 2024: [Indictment]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • December 23, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • December 23, 2022: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • December 23, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 22, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 20, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 20, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 20, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.