U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00233-
  • Case Name: Danil Ezekiel Faust
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Motion - Generic (USE ONLY IF NO OTHER EVENT MATCHES)]
  • January 20, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal]
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [eNoticing Request Form]
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Support Document]
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Statement of Intent (Original or Amended)]
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules - Form 106Dec]
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Schedules A/B-J]
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Amended Voluntary Petition]
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Motion - Generic (USE ONLY IF NO OTHER EVENT MATCHES)]
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Notice of Appeal]
  • January 16, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order on Generic Motion ]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Examination]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Automatic Stay]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Amended Order]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Response]
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Amended Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities]
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Motion - Generic (USE ONLY IF NO OTHER EVENT MATCHES)]
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Examination]
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Impose Automatic Stay]
  • January 03, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order on Generic Motion ]
December, 2022
  • December 31, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Motion - Generic (USE ONLY IF NO OTHER EVENT MATCHES)]
  • December 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
  • December 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • December 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • December 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [List of Creditors and Mailing Matrix]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Deficiency Letter - Case Opening]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Notice Of Requirement To File Certification About A Financial Management Course (Ch 7)]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [eNoticing Request Form]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Support Document]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules - Form 106Dec]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Schedules A/B-J]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Statement of Intent (Original or Amended)]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • December 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • December 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.