U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00410-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WRIGHT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • May 07, 2025: [Hearing ]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 24, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Return of Property/PreTrial]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Status Report]
  • December 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review]
  • December 22, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • December 22, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 22, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 21, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • December 21, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • December 21, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 21, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 21, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.