U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00412-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MILLER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 10, 2023: [Status Conference]
  • January 10, 2023: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice of Error]
  • January 09, 2023: [Supplement to any document]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 04, 2023: [.Order]
  • January 04, 2023: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • December 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • December 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • December 30, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • December 28, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • December 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 23, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • December 22, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 22, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • December 22, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 22, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 22, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • December 22, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.