U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-10015-
  • Case Name: Bryan S. Ross, Chapter 7 Trustee for Box 20, Inc. v. Blue Ridge Bank, N.A.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • January 20, 2023: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Disposition of Adversary]
  • January 19, 2023: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Voluntary or Stipulated Dismissal]
  • January 04, 2023: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Stipulation]
December, 2022
  • December 25, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 23, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons - Service Executed]
  • December 23, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • December 23, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order - Generic]
  • December 22, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Defer Fee]
  • December 22, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Draft Summons]
  • December 22, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.