U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00413-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BOX
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • October 11, 2024: [Dismiss Count(s)]
  • October 09, 2024: [.Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [Transcript]
  • October 08, 2024: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • October 08, 2024: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • October 02, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • January 20, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • January 20, 2023: [Status Conference]
  • January 20, 2023: [Disclosure ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 09, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 09, 2023: [Speedy Trial ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Receipt for Passport]
  • January 05, 2023: [Protective Order ]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 23, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 23, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • December 23, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 22, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 22, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 22, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.