U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00238
  • Case Name: Muse Threads Inc
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
February, 2025
  • February 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Chapter 11 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Order]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Compensation]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Hearing - Held (BK)]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Employ]
  • January 23, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Approve Compromise Under FRBP 9019]
  • January 23, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • January 23, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Operating Report]
  • January 21, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 20, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Order - Generic]
  • January 20, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Hearing - Scheduled (by Order) BK]
  • January 18, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Order]
  • January 18, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Witness and Exhibit List]
  • January 13, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Condition Rights]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Notice - Generic]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Hearing - Scheduled (by Order) BK]
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Approve Compromise Under FRBP 9019]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Support Document]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Order]
  • January 04, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Use Cash Collateral]
  • January 03, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Order on Generic Motion ]
  • January 03, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Pay]
  • January 03, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Support Document]
December, 2022
  • December 31, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Stay]
  • December 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [First Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • December 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • December 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Hearing - Scheduled (BK)]
  • December 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Hearing - Scheduled (by Order) BK]
  • December 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Certificate of Service]
  • December 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee]
  • December 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • December 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • December 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Motion - Generic (USE ONLY IF NO OTHER EVENT MATCHES)]
  • December 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Motion - Generic (USE ONLY IF NO OTHER EVENT MATCHES)]
  • December 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Exhibit]
  • December 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit]
  • December 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Stay]
  • December 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Stay]
  • December 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Wee, Jolene E [Pay ]
  • December 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Pay ]
  • December 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • December 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Pay ]
  • December 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • December 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • December 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.