U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00239
  • Case Name: Kellee Genean Baker
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice - Generic]
  • January 23, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order To Show Cause]
  • January 23, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • January 23, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Convert Case to 7]
  • January 23, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • January 23, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Schedule J]
  • January 23, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Schedule I]
  • January 23, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Schedule G]
  • January 23, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Schedule A/B]
  • January 20, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • January 20, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Convert Case to 7]
  • January 13, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Response]
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Response]
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 04, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • January 04, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order To File Amended Certificate Of Credit Counseling Or Show Cause]
  • January 03, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [List of Creditors and Mailing Matrix]
  • January 03, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Deficiency Letter - Case Opening]
  • December 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors 13 (Auto Assigned)]
  • December 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • December 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • December 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • December 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • December 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • December 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • December 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • December 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.