U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00414-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JOHNSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Protective Order ]
  • January 05, 2023: [.Order]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice of Proposed Order]
  • January 04, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 04, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • January 04, 2023: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 28, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 28, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 28, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.