U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00132
  • Case Name: In Re RULE 45 SUBPOENA ISSUED TO HUE.AI, LLC
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Stay]
  • January 18, 2023: [Response to motion]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 06, 2023: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • December 30, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
  • December 30, 2022: [Motion to Compel (Initiating)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.