U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-00001
  • Case Name: Stephanie Jo Marchese
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Original or Amended)]
  • January 23, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Domestic Support Obligations]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Certification About A Financial Management Course (Original or Amended)]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 03, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • January 02, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • January 01, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors 13 (Auto Assigned)]
  • January 01, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • January 01, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • January 01, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2 (Original or Amended)]
  • January 01, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income 122C-1 (Original or Amended)]
  • January 01, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • January 01, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • January 01, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2 (Original or Amended)]
  • January 01, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income 122C-1 (Original or Amended)]
  • January 01, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • January 01, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • January 01, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • January 01, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • January 01, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • January 01, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • January 01, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • January 01, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.