U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. COTTON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 23, 2023: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Protective Order ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Disclosure ]
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 04, 2023: [.Order]
  • January 04, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 03, 2023: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.