U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-00002-
  • Case Name: Dionne Lewis
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 15, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 13, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Order To Show Cause]
  • January 08, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Deficiency Letter - Case Opening]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Notice Of Requirement To File Certification About A Financial Management Course (Ch 7)]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Statement of Intent (Original or Amended)]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Schedule H]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Schedule G]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules - Form 106Dec]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • January 04, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • January 04, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.