U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-mj-00004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. STEWART
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • January 18, 2023: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • January 18, 2023: [Speedy Trial ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Release from Custody ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • January 12, 2023: [Release from Custody ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • January 10, 2023: [.Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • January 10, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 10, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 10, 2023: [Temporary Detention ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 10, 2023: [Arrest ]
  • January 09, 2023: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.