U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-00008
  • Case Name: Carla S. Carraway
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order Dismiss Case]
  • September 25, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Appearance (Attorney)]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Condition Rights]
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Scheduled (BK)]
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [First Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Deficiency Letter - Case Opening]
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Statement of Monthly Income Form 122B (Original or Amended)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.