U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-mj-00285-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MORALES-PONCE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • January 23, 2023: [Dismiss Case]
  • January 11, 2023: [.Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 11, 2023: [Speedy Trial ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • January 11, 2023: [Release from Custody ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • January 10, 2023: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • January 09, 2023: [.Order]
  • January 09, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • January 09, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • January 09, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 09, 2023: [Temporary Detention ]
  • January 09, 2023: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 09, 2023: [Unseal Case]
  • January 09, 2023: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 09, 2023: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.