U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-00009-
  • Case Name: Micheal V Barnett
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 18, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order To Show Cause]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Deficiency Letter - Case Opening]
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors 13 (Auto Assigned)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.