U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-00013
  • Case Name: Whitney Constance Mirts and John Mark King
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Close Case and Discharge Trustee]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order To Close Case & Discharge Trustee - Ch 7 Asset]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Account of Distribution (TDR)]
November, 2024
  • November 19, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Report Before Distribution (TFR)]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 15, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 15, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 13, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Notice Of Requirement To File Certification About A Financial Management Course (Ch 7)]
  • January 13, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Notice of Appearance (Add Party to Matrix)]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.